House | 08/05/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 30 | |
House | 08/05/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SJR 1 | Journal Page: 28 |
House | 08/05/2013 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 08/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 08/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 40 | |
House | 08/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 08/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 08/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 08/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 07/30/2013 | Referred to Transportation Funding, Select | Journal Page: 4 | |
House | 07/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4 | |
House | 07/30/2013 | Filed |