E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor/line item veto
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/10/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5223
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5222
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5222
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1663
|
Journal Page: 5222
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5220
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 13, Section 9
|
Journal Page: 5221
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3315
|
Journal Page: 5219
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5565
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1019
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1943
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1061
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#338
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
Darby
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1822
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1819
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 794
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 674
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#159
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
427-Miles
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
425-Leach
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
426-Leach and Anchia
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
425-Leach
|
Journal Page: 1332
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
421-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 1332
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 1330
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amended
|
420-Farney
|
Journal Page: 1329
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
417-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 1327
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
253-Burrows
|
Journal Page: 1240
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
238-Koop
|
Journal Page: 1230
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
204-Cook
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
163-S. Turner and Huberty
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
173-Blanco and Guillen
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
172-Blanco and Guillen
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
170-Canales, et al.
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
167-Nevrez
|
Journal Page: 1182
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#136
|
Journal Page: 1181
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
166-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amended
|
165-Muoz
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
161-Huberty, et al.
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
160-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1177
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1176
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
137-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 1167
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 4
|
Journal Page: 1138
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
77-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
34-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
32-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1101
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
27-Howard
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1024
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#92
|
Journal Page: 1023
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1023
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|