E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1728
|
Journal Page: 5528
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5521
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2876
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2029
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1861
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1861
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1861
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4033
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4033
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4033
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1699
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1091
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1455
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1455
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#187
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Faircloth and G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1402
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1402
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Faircloth and G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1402
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 1402
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1402
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|