House | 05/15/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3567 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 31 | Journal Page: 3567 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3478 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 246 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 246 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |