Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1038 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheffield, Alonzo (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1038
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to premium payment assistance for insurance coverage for
 hemophilia medical treatment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In addition to providing financial assistance under
 Subsection (c), the department may assist an eligible person in
 obtaining insurance by providing premium payment assistance.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *