House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3086 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#902 | Journal Page: 3085 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3085 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | 2-Canales | Journal Page: 3085 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 1-C. Turner | Journal Page: 3083 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3083 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 01/30/2015 | Filed |