Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2438
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1941
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1011
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3213
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3213
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/12/15 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3198
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/12/15 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/8/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|