House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3433 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1078 | Journal Page: 3433 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3433 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 2-Howard | Journal Page: 3432 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3432 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 11:00 AM | Journal Page: 3420 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3373 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3373 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 6:00 AM | Journal Page: 3250 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3250 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3016 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2915 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2523 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2523 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Filed |