House | 05/04/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2407 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 112 | Journal Page: 2407 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1963 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Postponed | 4/24/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1644 |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1644 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Filed |