Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1079 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1079
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the distribution of certain civil penalties, payments,
 and civil restitution received by the attorney general.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.007(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (d), the comptroller shall credit
 to the judicial fund for programs approved by the supreme court that
 provide basic civil legal services to the indigent the net amount
 of:
 (1)  a civil penalty or payment, excluding attorney's
 fees or costs, that is recovered in an action by the attorney
 general in any matter actionable under the [Subchapter E, Chapter
 17,] Business & Commerce Code, after deducting amounts allocated to
 or retained by the attorney general as authorized by law, unless:
 (A)  another law requires that the funds [penalty]
 be credited to a different fund or account; or
 (B)  the judgment awarding the funds [penalty]
 requires that the funds [penalty] be paid to another identifiable
 [named] recipient; and
 (2)  civil restitution recovered by the attorney
 general in an action brought by the attorney general [arising from
 conduct that violates a consumer protection, public health, or
 general welfare law,] if, on the hearing of an ex parte motion filed
 by the attorney general after the entry of a judgment awarding civil
 restitution, the court:
 (A)  determines that, based on the facts and
 circumstances of the case:
 (i)  it is impossible or impracticable to
 identify injured parties;
 (ii)  it is impossible or impracticable to
 determine the degree to which each claimant was injured and
 entitled to recover;
 (iii)  the cost of administering a claim
 procedure will disproportionately reduce the amount of restitution
 available for the payment of individual claims; or
 (iv)  the claims of all identifiable persons
 eligible to receive restitution have been paid without exhausting
 the funds available for restitution; and
 (B)  enters a judgment or order that the
 restitution be credited to the judicial fund for programs approved
 by the supreme court that provide basic civil legal services to the
 indigent.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a civil penalty, payment, or civil restitution that is received
 by the attorney general on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A civil penalty, payment, or civil restitution received by the
 attorney general before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this
 Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *