Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1080 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 1080
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of a state judge for purposes of state
 driver's license and personal identification laws.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.001(a)(8-a), Transportation Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (8-a)  "State judge" means:
 (A)  the judge of an appellate court, a district
 court, [or] a county court at law, or a statutory probate court of
 this state; or
 (B)  an associate judge appointed under Chapter
 201, Family Code, Chapter 54A, Government Code, or Chapter 574,
 Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *