Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1095 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/03/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R1932 CJC-D
 By: Springer H.B. No. 1095


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dedication of certain wine-related revenue.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 205.03(b), (c), (k), (l), and (p),
 Alcoholic Beverage Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The [Notwithstanding Section 205.02, the] following
 revenue may be appropriated for each state fiscal year only as
 specified by this section:
 (1)  [the lesser of:
 [(A)]  the amount, if any, by which the amount of
 revenue derived from excise taxes on wine produced in a state other
 than Texas and any sales taxes collected from holders of
 out-of-state winery direct shipper's permits as a result of the
 passage of Senate Bill No. 877 by the 79th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2005, according to the most recent projection, as of the
 beginning of the fiscal year, by the comptroller for the fiscal year
 exceeds the amount of revenue from those sources for fiscal year
 2004, compounded annually for fiscal years 2005-2017 [2005-2015] by
 the average percentage by which revenue from those sources
 increased from one fiscal year to the next between September 1,
 1999, and August 31, 2003; [or
 [(B)  $1 million;] and
 (2)  [the lesser of:
 [(A)]  the amount, if any, by which revenue
 derived from excise taxes on wine produced in this state and sales
 taxes remitted by holders of winery permits in this state,
 according to the most recent projection, as of the beginning of the
 fiscal year, by the comptroller for the fiscal year exceeds the
 amount of revenue from those sources for fiscal year 2004,
 compounded annually for fiscal years 2005-2017 [2005-2015] by the
 average percentage by which revenue from those sources increased
 from one fiscal year to the next between September 1, 1999, and
 August 31, 2003[; or
 [(B)  $1 million].
 (c)  Out of the amounts available under Subsections (b)(1)
 and (2) for a fiscal year, the lesser of $50,000 or the total amount
 available under those subdivisions may be appropriated only to the
 Texas A&M AgriLife [Cooperative] Extension Service for extension
 viticulture operations.
 (k)  If the amount available for a fiscal year under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds the amount that may be
 appropriated under Subsections (c)-(j):
 (1)  the lesser of the amount remaining under
 Subsection (b)(2) or $250,000 may be appropriated only to the
 commission; and
 (2)  the commission shall reduce the amount of the
 surcharge imposed during the following fiscal year under Section
 5.56 [5.55, as added by Chapter 101, Acts of the 78th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2003,] on permit and license holders who are not
 authorized to sell wine by an amount that will reduce the total
 amount collected under that section by the amount appropriated to
 the commission under Subdivision (1).
 (l)  If the amount available for a fiscal year under
 Subsections (b)(1) and (2) exceeds the amounts that may be
 appropriated under Subsections (c)-(k), the remaining amount shall
 be deposited in the general revenue fund to the credit of the wine
 industry development fund and may be appropriated only to the
 Department of Agriculture[.     Money appropriated under this
 subsection may be used only] for the purpose of providing funding to
 public or private entities to conduct surveys, research, and other
 projects related to a purpose described by Subsection (m) or (n).
 (p)  This section expires September 1, 2017 [2015].
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall
 establish the wine industry development fund in accordance with
 Section 50B.003, Agriculture Code, as if the wine industry
 development fund had not been abolished by operation of Section 2,
 Chapter 1358 (S.B. 1605), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2005. The wine industry development fund is re-created by
 this Act. The dedications of money in the wine industry development
 fund made by Section 50B.003, Agriculture Code, and Section 205.03,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code, in Chapters 375 (S.B. 1370) and 878 (S.B.
 1137), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005, that
 were abolished by operation of Section 2, Chapter 1358 (S.B. 1605),
 Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005, are
 rededicated by this Act for the same purposes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.