E
|
06/09/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5146
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5146
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1645
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5146
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4808
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2402
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA11 Hall
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2292
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 516
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 961
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 863
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#78
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 839
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#76
|
Journal Page: 838
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
47-Canales
|
Journal Page: 833
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
48-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 832
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
47-Canales
|
Journal Page: 832
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
46-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
44-Muoz
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
45-Guillen
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Amended
|
12-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 805
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 801
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#57
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 584
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|