Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1101 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1101
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
3- May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
4- May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 13,
5- Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1101
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to extending the period over which the balance of the
126 system benefit fund is to be eliminated.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Section 39.903(m), Utilities Code, is amended to
159 read as follows:
1610 (m) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2016].
1711 SECTION 2. Section 39.9039, Utilities Code, is amended to
1812 read as follows:
1913 Sec. 39.9039. ELIMINATION OF SYSTEM BENEFIT FUND BALANCE.
2014 (a) Notwithstanding Section 39.903(b), the commission shall set the
2115 nonbypassable system benefit fund fee at the amount of zero cents
2216 per megawatt hour for the period beginning September 1, 2013, and
2317 ending September 1, 2017 [2016].
2418 (b) Notwithstanding Section 39.903(e), money in the system
2519 benefit fund may be appropriated:
2620 (1) [for the state fiscal year beginning September 1,
2721 2013, a program established by the commission to assist low-income
2822 electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the months of
2923 September, 2013, and May through August, 2014, in the manner
3024 prescribed by Section 39.903(h) at a rate of up to 82 percent;
3125 [(2)] for the state fiscal year beginning September 1,
3226 2014, to a program established by the commission to assist
3327 low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate for the
3428 months of September, 2014, and May through August, 2015, in the
3529 manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at a rate of up to 15
3630 percent;
3731 (2) [(3)] for the state fiscal year beginning
3832 September 1, 2015, to a program established by the commission to
3933 assist low-income electric customers by providing a reduced rate
4034 for the months of September, 2015, [and May] through August, 2016,
4135 in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at the [a] rate the
4236 commission determines is necessary to exhaust the system benefit
4337 fund [of up to 15 percent];
4438 (3) for the state fiscal year beginning September 1,
4539 2016, if any money remains in the fund, to a program established by
4640 the commission to assist low-income electric customers by providing
4741 a reduced rate for the months of September, 2016, through August,
4842 2017, in the manner prescribed by Section 39.903(h), at the rate the
4943 commission determines is necessary to exhaust the system benefit
5044 fund; and
5145 (4) for customer education programs and
5246 administrative expenses incurred by the commission in implementing
5347 and administering this chapter.
5448 (c) This section expires September 1, 2017 [2016].
5549 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5650 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5751 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5852 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5953 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
60- * * * * *
54+ ______________________________ ______________________________
55+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
56+ I certify that H.B. No. 1101 was passed by the House on May 8,
57+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 1 present, not
58+ voting.
59+ ______________________________
60+ Chief Clerk of the House
61+ I certify that H.B. No. 1101 was passed by the Senate on May
62+ 24, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3.
63+ ______________________________
64+ Secretary of the Senate
65+ APPROVED: _____________________
66+ Date
67+ _____________________
68+ Governor