Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#385 | Journal Page: 1961 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1961 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1961 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1914 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amended | 1-Wu | Journal Page: 1913 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 985 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 02/03/2015 | Filed |