Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1128 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

                    By: Fletcher (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 1128
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for recipients
 of the Combat Action Badge, Medal, or Ribbon.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.315, 504.316, [or]
 504.319, or 504.320.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.320 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.320.  COMBAT ACTION BADGE, MEDAL, OR RIBBON
 RECIPIENTS. (a)  The department shall issue specialty license
 plates for recipients of the Combat Action Badge. License plates
 issued under this subsection must include the Combat Action Badge
 Combat Infantryman emblem and must include the words "Combat Action
 Badge" at the bottom of each plate.
 (b)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Combat Action Medal. License plates issued under
 this subsection must include the Combat Action Medal emblem and
 must include the words "Combat Action Medal" at the bottom of each
 plate.
 (c)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Combat Action Ribbon. License plates issued
 under this subsection must include the Combat Action Ribbon emblem
 and must include the words "Combat Action Ribbon" at the bottom of
 each plate.
 (d)  For purposes of Subsections (a) and (c), if a branch of
 the United States armed forces awards a Combat Action Badge or
 Ribbon with a unique emblem for each award of the Combat Action
 Badge or Ribbon to a recipient, the department shall only issue
 specialty license plates that include the unique emblem of the
 first award.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *