LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB114
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB114
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB114
Compare Versions
HB114 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB114 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB114 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB114 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB114 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB114 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB114 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB114 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB114 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB114 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB114 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB114 Engrossed May 13, 2015
HB114 Comm Sub April 21, 2015
HB114 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare