Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 958 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1599 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 544 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 544 | |
House | 02/04/2015 | Filed |