1 | 1 | | 84R197 TJB-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Turner of Collin H.B. No. 1152 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering |
---|
8 | 8 | | the rates of the tax. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections |
---|
11 | 11 | | 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as |
---|
13 | 13 | | provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.75 |
---|
14 | 14 | | [one] percent of taxable margin. |
---|
15 | 15 | | (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of |
---|
16 | 16 | | the franchise tax is 0.38 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those |
---|
17 | 17 | | taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
19 | 19 | | or after January 1, 2016. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Sections |
---|
21 | 21 | | 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as |
---|
23 | 23 | | provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.50 |
---|
24 | 24 | | [one] percent of taxable margin. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of |
---|
26 | 26 | | the franchise tax is 0.25 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those |
---|
27 | 27 | | taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
29 | 29 | | or after January 1, 2017. |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Sections |
---|
31 | 31 | | 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as |
---|
33 | 33 | | provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.25 |
---|
34 | 34 | | [one] percent of taxable margin. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of |
---|
36 | 36 | | the franchise tax is 0.13 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those |
---|
37 | 37 | | taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
39 | 39 | | or after January 1, 2018. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section |
---|
41 | 41 | | 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
42 | 42 | | (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that |
---|
43 | 43 | | elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is |
---|
44 | 44 | | computed by: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue |
---|
46 | 46 | | from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (2) apportioning the amount computed under |
---|
48 | 48 | | Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to |
---|
49 | 49 | | determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) by the rate of 0.43 [0.575] percent. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
53 | 53 | | or after January 1, 2016. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 5. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Section |
---|
55 | 55 | | 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that |
---|
57 | 57 | | elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is |
---|
58 | 58 | | computed by: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue |
---|
60 | 60 | | from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) apportioning the amount computed under |
---|
62 | 62 | | Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to |
---|
63 | 63 | | determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and |
---|
64 | 64 | | (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) by the rate of 0.29 [0.575] percent. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
67 | 67 | | or after January 1, 2017. |
---|
68 | 68 | | SECTION 6. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Section |
---|
69 | 69 | | 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that |
---|
71 | 71 | | elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is |
---|
72 | 72 | | computed by: |
---|
73 | 73 | | (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue |
---|
74 | 74 | | from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011; |
---|
75 | 75 | | (2) apportioning the amount computed under |
---|
76 | 76 | | Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to |
---|
77 | 77 | | determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision |
---|
79 | 79 | | (2) by the rate of 0.14 [0.575] percent. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on |
---|
81 | 81 | | or after January 1, 2018. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 7. Section 171.362(f), Tax Code, is amended to read |
---|
83 | 83 | | as follows: |
---|
84 | 84 | | (f) In addition to any other penalty authorized by this |
---|
85 | 85 | | section, a taxable entity that owes a tax for a reporting period and |
---|
86 | 86 | | [who] fails to file a report for the reporting period as required by |
---|
87 | 87 | | this chapter shall pay a penalty of $50. The penalty provided by |
---|
88 | 88 | | this subsection is assessed without regard to whether the taxable |
---|
89 | 89 | | entity subsequently files the report [or whether any taxes were due |
---|
90 | 90 | | from the taxable entity for the reporting period under the required |
---|
91 | 91 | | report]. |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 8. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax |
---|
94 | 94 | | imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2018, shall |
---|
95 | 95 | | file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as |
---|
96 | 96 | | required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2019. The |
---|
97 | 97 | | transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have |
---|
98 | 98 | | paid in 2019 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code, |
---|
99 | 99 | | had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code, |
---|
100 | 100 | | relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain |
---|
101 | 101 | | in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section |
---|
102 | 102 | | for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax |
---|
103 | 103 | | required by this subsection. |
---|
104 | 104 | | (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax |
---|
105 | 105 | | Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations, |
---|
106 | 106 | | and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including |
---|
107 | 107 | | the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until |
---|
108 | 108 | | barred by limitations. |
---|
109 | 109 | | (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect: |
---|
110 | 110 | | (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its |
---|
111 | 111 | | corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of |
---|
112 | 112 | | organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate |
---|
113 | 113 | | charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a |
---|
114 | 114 | | receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter; |
---|
115 | 115 | | (2) the ability of the comptroller, secretary of |
---|
116 | 116 | | state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity |
---|
117 | 117 | | under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took |
---|
118 | 118 | | place before the repeal; or |
---|
119 | 119 | | (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a |
---|
120 | 120 | | forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under |
---|
121 | 121 | | Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter. |
---|
122 | 122 | | (e) This section takes effect January 1, 2019. |
---|
123 | 123 | | SECTION 9. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
124 | 124 | | Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the |
---|
125 | 125 | | effective date of this Act. |
---|
126 | 126 | | SECTION 10. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
127 | 127 | | Act takes effect January 1, 2016. |
---|