Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1309
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#525
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2354
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
House
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 544
|
House
|
02/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|