House
|
05/11/2015
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32 and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/11/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2952
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 2952
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2951
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
House
|
02/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|