House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 02/06/2015 | Filed |