Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1202 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 84R25437 AJZ-D
22 By: Muñoz, Jr. H.B. No. 1202
33 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1202:
44 By: González C.S.H.B. No. 1202
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to the creation of the community nutrition program policy
1010 advisory council.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Title 2, Agriculture Code, is amended by adding
1313 Chapter 26 to read as follows:
1414 CHAPTER 26. COMMUNITY NUTRITION PROGRAM POLICY ADVISORY COUNCIL
1515 Sec. 26.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "advisory
1616 council" means the community nutrition program policy advisory
1717 council.
1818 Sec. 26.002. ADVISORY COUNCIL ESTABLISHED. The community
1919 nutrition program policy advisory council is an advisory council
2020 established to support the goals, initiatives, and policies of the
2121 department's food and nutrition division.
2222 Sec. 26.003. APPOINTMENT OF MEMBERS; TERMS. (a) The
2323 advisory council is composed of five members appointed by the
2424 commissioner as follows:
2525 (1) two members representing the community
2626 organizations that contract with the Child and Adult Care Food
2727 Program, including:
2828 (A) one member that provides services to child
2929 care centers; and
3030 (B) one member that provides services to day care
3131 home providers; and
3232 (2) one member representing the community
3333 organizations that contract with the summer food service program
3434 under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761;
3535 (3) one member representing the community
3636 organizations that contract with the commodity supplemental food
3737 program under 7 C.F.R. Part 247; and
3838 (4) one member who serves as the president of the Texas
3939 CACFP Sponsor's Association.
4040 (b) In making the appointments required under Subsection
4141 (a), the commissioner shall:
4242 (1) give preference to individuals who are
4343 professional educators or child care providers, individuals who
4444 have experience and expertise in an area of interest to the advisory
4545 council, and individuals who display a commitment to excellence in
4646 the administration of community nutrition programs; and
4747 (2) attempt to appoint a balance of members
4848 representing business, labor, civic, educational, parental, and
4949 professional groups, while striving for diversity and geographic
5050 representation.
5151 (c) The commissioner, in consultation with the chief
5252 administrator of the food and nutrition division of the department,
5353 shall appoint a chair from among the members. The advisory council
5454 members may elect a vice chair.
5555 (d) Members of the advisory council serve staggered terms of
5656 three years.
5757 Sec. 26.004. DUTIES. (a) To improve community nutrition
5858 programs in this state, the advisory council shall:
5959 (1) advise the department on policy, rules, and
6060 program operations, including program recommendations for meeting
6161 federal or state requirements;
6262 (2) advise the department on program materials;
6363 (3) identify training priorities for the department;
6464 (4) propose solutions to address gaps, flaws,
6565 inefficiencies, or problems in the state's administration of
6666 nutrition programs;
6767 (5) develop and implement a plan for improving
6868 relationships between entities that contract with the department
6969 and other state agencies in connection with the state's nutrition
7070 policies and programs, including establishing best practices for
7171 department cooperation and collaboration with entities that
7272 contract with the department;
7373 (6) identify and address duplication of services
7474 provided by entities that contract with the department; and
7575 (7) advise the commissioner and the department's chief
7676 administrator of food and nutrition on nutrition policy priorities,
7777 including priorities for the use and allocation of federal money
7878 and recommendations for the food and nutrition division regarding
7979 the allocation of federal money.
8080 (b) The advisory council shall conduct a review of the
8181 state's nutrition policies and programs. The advisory council may
8282 meet with representatives of the state agencies that administer the
8383 nutrition programs as necessary to conduct the review.
8484 (c) The commissioner may direct the advisory council to
8585 focus the advisory council's efforts in particular areas that will
8686 inform the efforts of the department.
8787 Sec. 26.005. LIAISON. (a) The chief administrator of the
8888 department's food and nutrition division shall appoint a staff
8989 member to serve as the advisory council's liaison.
9090 (b) The liaison shall:
9191 (1) facilitate communications between the advisory
9292 council and the department;
9393 (2) post advisory council meeting notices and other
9494 information on the advisory council's website; and
9595 (3) attend each advisory council meeting.
9696 Sec. 26.006. MEETINGS OF ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a) The
9797 advisory council shall meet at times and locations as determined by
9898 the chair, not to exceed four meetings per year.
9999 (b) Advisory council members may not participate remotely
100100 in a meeting by telephone conference call, videoconference, or
101101 other similar telecommunications methods permitted under Chapter
102102 551, Government Code.
103103 (c) The advisory council shall keep minutes of the advisory
104104 council's meetings and any subcommittee meetings and shall post the
105105 minutes on the advisory council's website.
106106 (d) The chair, in consultation with the liaison, shall
107107 prepare a meeting agenda, if necessary.
108108 (e) The chair may share meeting agendas, minutes, and
109109 notices with members of the advisory council by telephone, e-mail,
110110 or fax.
111111 (f) The advisory council must maintain advisory council
112112 records in accordance with state and department record retention
113113 schedules.
114114 (g) Records of the advisory council are public information
115115 subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
116116 Sec. 26.007. ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than September 30 of
117117 each year, the advisory council shall submit an annual report to the
118118 commissioner on:
119119 (1) current issues in the field of community nutrition
120120 programs relevant to the department's goals and strategic
121121 initiatives;
122122 (2) the advisory council's efforts to support the
123123 goals and objectives of the department;
124124 (3) the advisory council's review of nutrition
125125 policies and programs conducted under Section 26.004(b); and
126126 (4) recommendations for the department, including any
127127 proposed legislative, rule, or policy changes for improving
128128 community nutrition programs.
129129 Sec. 26.008. REIMBURSEMENT. An advisory council member is
130130 not entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for
131131 travel expenses incurred by the member while conducting the
132132 business of the advisory council.
133133 Sec. 26.009. SUNSET PROVISION. The advisory council is
134134 subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
135135 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the advisory
136136 council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2021.
137137 Sec. 26.010. APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
138138 Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council.
139139 SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2015, the commissioner
140140 of agriculture shall appoint the members of the community nutrition
141141 program policy advisory council established by Chapter 26,
142142 Agriculture Code, as added by this Act. In appointing the initial
143143 members of the advisory council, the commissioner shall appoint two
144144 persons to terms expiring October 1, 2016, two persons to terms
145145 expiring October 1, 2017, and one person to a term expiring October
146146 1, 2018.
147147 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
148148 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
149149 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
150150 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
151151 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.