E | 05/21/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/21/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4218 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3406 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3107 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2831 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1443 | |
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 930 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1562 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1561 |
House | 04/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1561 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1545 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1545 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 545 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Filed |