By: Pickett (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 122 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015; April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the Texas Mobility Fund. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 201.943(a) and (l), Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Subject to Subsections (e), (f), [and] (g), and (l), the commission by order or resolution may issue obligations in the name and on behalf of the state and the department and may enter into credit agreements related to the obligations. The obligations may be issued in multiple series and issues from time to time in an aggregate amount not exceeding the maximum obligation amount. The obligations may be issued on and may have the terms and provisions the commission determines appropriate and in the interests of the state. The obligations may be issued as long-term obligations, short-term obligations, or both. The latest scheduled maturity of an issue or series of obligations may not exceed 30 years. (l) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, obligations [Obligations] may not be issued under this section or Section 49-k, Article III, Texas Constitution, after January 1, 2015 [if the commission or the department requires that toll roads be included in a regional mobility plan in order for a local authority to receive an allocation from the fund]. The commission may issue obligations to refund: (1) outstanding obligations to provide savings to the state; and (2) outstanding variable rate obligations and may renew or replace credit agreements relating to the variable rate obligations. SECTION 2. Section 201.946(d), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) To the extent money is on deposit in the fund in amounts that are in excess of the money required by the proceedings authorizing the obligations and credit agreements to be retained on deposit, the commission may use the money for any purpose for which obligations may be issued under this subchapter, other than for toll roads. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *