Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#954 | Journal Page: 3170 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3170 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3079 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3079 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3079 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2112 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 522 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Filed |