LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1265
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1265
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1265
Compare Versions
HB1265 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1265 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1265 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1265 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB1265 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB1265 Comm Sub April 1, 2015
HB1265 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1265 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1265 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1265 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB1265 Comm Sub May 24, 2015
HB1265 Engrossed May 17, 2015
HB1265 Comm Sub April 1, 2015
HB1265 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare