Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3310 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1027 | Journal Page: 3310 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3310 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Thompson | Journal Page: 3309 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3309 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3232 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#979 | Journal Page: 3232 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3232 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 1-Simmons and S. King | Journal Page: 3231 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 5:00 PM | Journal Page: 3199 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3199 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2675 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Filed |