Senate | 05/19/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1097 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#343 | Journal Page: 1853 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1853 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1853 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1806 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Amended | 4-Larson | Journal Page: 1806 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Filed |