Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1427 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#725 | Journal Page: 2720 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2720 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2719 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#684 | Journal Page: 2647 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 3-Capriglione | Journal Page: 2646 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Postponed | 5/6/15 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 2628 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2628 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Filed |