E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1824
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5966
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3488
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1064
|
Journal Page: 3614
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3133
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5123
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4757
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1508
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#851
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 2982
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2981
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2950
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
2-P. King and Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 2949
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to General Investigating & Ethics
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|