Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 11, Section 2; Article III, Section 35
|
Journal Page: 5562
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4981
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 V. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2638
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2637
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1252
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2273
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#492
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Sanford
|
Journal Page: 2185
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2184
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|