Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB13 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 13
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 13 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to categories of and funding allocation for transportation
 projects by the Texas Department of Transportation and local
 transportation entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 201.9901 and 201.9902 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 201.9901.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Planning organization" means:
 (A)  a metropolitan planning organization; or
 (B)  for an area that is not within the boundaries
 of a metropolitan planning organization, the department district
 that serves the area.
 (2)  "Project" means a connectivity or new capacity
 roadway project in the region of a planning organization. The term
 does not include a safety project, bridge project, federal
 discretionary project, maintenance project, or preservation
 project.
 (3)  "Region" means the area for which a planning
 organization develops plans under this subchapter.
 (4)  "Transportation official" means an official in a
 political subdivision who has responsibility for planning and
 implementation of transportation projects.
 Sec. 201.9902.  UPDATE TO TRANSPORTATION FUNDING CATEGORIES
 AND ALLOCATION FORMULAS. (a) Not later than October 1, 2015, the
 commission shall initiate a process to review the categories and
 formulas adopted under Sections 201.991(b)(2) and 201.996.
 (b)  The review process must include an effort by the
 department to seek the collective input of all planning
 organizations in the state. The department shall convene meetings
 as necessary to facilitate discussions among planning
 organizations that will result in a consensus recommendation among
 a majority of the planning organizations as to updated funding
 categories and funding allocation formulas.
 (c)  Not later than May 1, 2016, the commission shall adopt
 rules implementing updated funding categories and funding
 allocation formulas. To the extent that the adopted categories or
 funding allocation formulas differ from the consensus
 recommendations of the planning organizations, the commission must
 provide a detailed written explanation for the differences. The
 explanation must be made available on the department's Internet
 website.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter P, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 201.9911, 201.9921, 201.9931, and
 201.9932 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.9911.  PLANNING ORGANIZATION 10-YEAR PLAN. (a)
 Each planning organization shall develop a 10-year transportation
 plan for the use of the funding allocated to the region. The
 department shall assist the planning organizations by providing in
 a timely manner such information as is reasonably requested by the
 planning organizations.
 (b)  The plan must identify the items described by Section
 201.9921(b) as applicable to the planning organization and the
 funding of transportation projects in the region.
 (c)  The first four years of the plan shall be developed to
 meet the transportation improvement plan requirements of 23 U.S.C.
 Section 134 or 135, as applicable.
 (d)  For an area that is not within the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization, the department district shall
 develop the 10-year transportation plan with input from municipal
 and county elected officials and transportation officials in the
 region.
 Sec. 201.9921.  TEN-YEAR CASH FLOW PROJECTION. (a) Not
 later than September 1 of each odd-numbered year, the department's
 chief financial officer shall prepare and publish a cash flow
 forecast for a period of not less than 10 years.
 (b)  The forecast must identify:
 (1)  the aggregate amount of all sources of funding
 available for eligible transportation projects;
 (2)  the amount previously committed to eligible
 transportation projects based on actions of the commission;
 (3)  the amount not committed to projects but that the
 department anticipates allocating during the forecast period
 through formulas adopted under Section 201.996; and
 (4)  the sources of all funds projected to be available
 during the forecast period, including bond proceeds, and an
 estimation of debt service payments associated with the bond
 proceeds.
 (c)  The first two years of the forecast must be based on the
 appropriation of funds in the General Appropriations Act for the
 department for that biennium.
 Sec. 201.9931.  PROJECT RECOMMENDATION AND PRIORITIZATION.
 (a) Each planning organization shall recommend projects in its
 region and prioritize them using the criteria developed under
 Section 201.9932 and in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section 135.
 (b)  For an area not located within the boundaries of a
 metropolitan planning organization, the applicable department
 district shall recommend projects and prioritize them with input
 from municipal and county elected officials and transportation
 officials using the criteria developed under Section 201.9932 and
 in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section 135.
 (c)  The department shall compile the project
 recommendations of the planning organizations to develop the
 statewide transportation plan in accordance with 23 U.S.C. Section
 135.
 Sec. 201.9932.  PROJECT RECOMMENDATION CRITERIA. Each
 planning organization shall develop its own project recommendation
 criteria, which must include consideration of:
 (1)  projected improvements to congestion and safety;
 (2)  projected effects on economic development
 opportunities for residents of the region;
 (3)  available funding;
 (4)  effects on the environment, including air quality;
 (5)  socioeconomic effects, including
 disproportionately high and adverse health or environmental
 effects on minority or low-income neighborhoods; and
 (6)  any other factors considered appropriate by the
 planning organization, including local criteria that focus on
 objectives unique to the organization's jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  Section 201.996, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission may not consider transferring funds
 between categories by any method outside the established formulas
 or allocating funds subject to the discretion of the commission
 unless:
 (1)  the commission considers the transfer or
 allocation at a regularly scheduled commission meeting; and
 (2)  the department presents to the commission a
 written explanation of the transfer, including the need and
 justification for the deviation from the formula allocation or use
 of discretionary funds, at a regularly scheduled commission meeting
 held in the month before the meeting described by Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *