Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1306 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hughes (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1306
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reimbursement of expenses incurred by court
 reporters in judicial districts composed of more than one county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 52.055(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Travel expenses reimbursed under this section may not
 exceed the reasonable mileage rate set by the commissioners court
 of the respective county of the judicial district for which the
 expenses were incurred [25 cents per mile] for the use of private
 conveyances, traveling the shortest practical route.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to
 expenses incurred by a court reporter on or after the effective date
 of this Act. Expenses incurred by a court reporter before the
 effective date of this Act are governed by the law in effect on the
 date the expenses were incurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *