Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1315 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2650 BEF-D
 By: Bohac H.B. No. 1315


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to temporary permissive alternate rates for the franchise
 tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 171.0024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 171.0024.  TEMPORARY PERMISSIVE ALTERNATE RATES FOR
 2016 AND 2017. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 171.002(a) and subject
 to Section 171.1016 and Subsection (b) of this section, a taxable
 entity may elect to pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate
 of 0.95 percent of taxable margin.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 171.002(b) and subject to
 Section 171.1016, a taxable entity primarily engaged in retail or
 wholesale trade as defined by Sections 171.002(c) and (c-1) may
 elect to pay the tax imposed under this chapter at a rate of 0.475
 percent of taxable margin.
 (c)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2018.
 (d)  This section expires December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.