House | 05/08/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2912 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1093 | Journal Page: 2911 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 5:30 AM | Journal Page: 2410 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2410 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/15 10:01 AM | Journal Page: 1963 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Postponed | 4/27/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 1818 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1435 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Filed |