E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5567
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2863
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5186
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5185
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1652
|
Journal Page: 5186
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5182
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4339
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1934
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3783
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3264
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1098
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#354
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1814
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Bond Indebtedness by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|