E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1164
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2014
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#401
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 1963
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1963
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/27/15 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 602
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|