E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5939
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1816
|
Journal Page: 5938
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5922
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3615
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5497
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5497
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5497
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Burton
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1028
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3233
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|