E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4466
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4109
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|