Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1422 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lozano, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1422
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1, 1 present not voting;
 May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the restoration of expired eminent domain authority of
 certain rural rail transportation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 172, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 172.1571 to read as follows:
 Sec. 172.1571.  RESTORATION OF CERTAIN EXPIRED EMINENT
 DOMAIN AUTHORITY. (a) This section applies only to a district:
 (1)  whose authority to exercise the power of eminent
 domain under Section 172.157 expired under Section 2206.101(c),
 Government Code; and
 (2)  that is located in a county adjacent to a county in
 which there is located a port authority that has the authority to
 issue a permit for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles
 under Subchapter O or P, Chapter 623.
 (b)  Notwithstanding the expiration of the district's
 authority as described by Subsection (a), the district, on and
 after September 1, 2015, may exercise the power of eminent domain in
 accordance with Section 172.157.
 SECTION 2.  As provided by Section 17(c), Article I, Texas
 Constitution, this Act takes effect only on a two-thirds vote of all
 the members elected to each house. If this Act receives the vote
 necessary to take effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *