Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1428 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, Naishtat, Elkins H.B. No. 1428
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of housing funds set aside for
 persons with disabilities through the homebuyer assistance
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.111, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-3) to read as follows:
 (c-3)  In administering funds that are set aside for persons
 with disabilities under Subsection (c)(2) and allocated through the
 homebuyer assistance program, the department:
 (1)  may not require a person to enter into a contract
 to purchase a home before applying for or reserving funds allocated
 through the program; and
 (2)  by rule shall implement a preapproval process
 under which a person:
 (A)  before funds allocated through the program
 are made available, may establish eligibility to receive those
 funds; and
 (B)  has an adequate period of at least 90 days in
 which to locate a home for purchase using funds made available under
 the program.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall adopt rules under Section 2306.111(c-3), Government
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for housing funds that are administered through
 the homebuyer assistance program submitted to the Texas Department
 of Housing and Community Affairs on or after the date the rules
 adopted by the department under Section 2306.111(c-3), Government
 Code, as added by this Act, take effect. An application for housing
 funds submitted before the date the rules take effect is governed by
 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *