Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1431 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1431
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of a career-oriented foreign language
 program that public schools may offer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (t) to read as follows:
 (t)  The State Board of Education, in consultation with the
 commissioner of higher education and business and industry leaders,
 shall develop an advanced language course that a school district
 may use in the curriculum under Subsection (a)(2)(A) to provide
 students with instruction in industry-related terminology that
 prepares students to communicate in a language other than English
 in a specific professional, business, or industry environment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *