Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1736 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1198 | Journal Page: 3800 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3791 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3791 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 3676 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 548 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Filed |