E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1571
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2881
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#798
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2880
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|