House | 05/15/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3585 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1120 | Journal Page: 3584 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3584 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3584 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3428 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3428 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1076 | Journal Page: 3427 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3427 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 3-Isaac and Harless | Journal Page: 3426 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Isaac, et al. | Journal Page: 3426 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment amended | 2-Springer | Journal Page: 3426 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Isaac and Harless | Journal Page: 3425 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3425 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 10:30 AM | Journal Page: 3419 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 7:05 PM | Journal Page: 3371 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3371 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/13/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3242 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 569 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Filed |