Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#671
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Galindo
|
Journal Page: 2605
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 40; Rule 8, Section 10; Rule 11, Section 2; Article III, Section 56(a)
|
Journal Page: 2603
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2603
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/6/15 11:45 AM
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Galindo
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|