House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5693
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3400
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5563
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2558
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2557
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2659
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1128
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3462
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Wu
|
Journal Page: 3461
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3461
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/14/15 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3459
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/13/15 11:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/13/15 5:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/11/15 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2532
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2532
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 612
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|