E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5343
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5344
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1691
|
Journal Page: 5343
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5343
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1635
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3580
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3579
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Amended
|
1-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|