Senate | 05/21/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1844 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1786 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3321 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1038 | Journal Page: 3320 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3320 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3320 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 1-Goldman, Capriglione, and Simmons | Journal Page: 3253 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3253 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 851 | |
House | 02/17/2015 | Filed |